THE JENNIFER D'ABO MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was founded to advance education for the benefit of the public by awarding grants to individual female recipients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Lom | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rory Farr | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LORD HENRY DENNISTON STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOEL MICHAEL CADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.18k | £2.75k | £3.55k | £3.81k | £8.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £810 | £8.71k | £864 | £8.87k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY AWARDING GRANTS OF MONEY TO INDIVIDUAL RECIPIENTS WHO SHALL BE FEMALE AND OF BRITISH NATIONALITY FOR THE IMMEDIATE PURPOSE OF ENABLING THE RECIPIENT TO PAY FOR TUITION AND RELATED FEES, BOOKS, OTHER EQUIPMENT AND ACCOMMODATION IN ORDER TO UNDERTAKE STUDY IN BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION AT OXFORD SAID BUSINESS SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING. 2. EVERY AWARD MADE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS SHALL BE CALLED A JENNIFER D'ABO MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4-5 ALBANY COURTYARD
LONDON
W1J 0HF
- Phone:
- 02074937820
- Email:
- Joel.Cadbury@longshotltd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window