WEST NORFOLK BEFRIENDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Norfolk Befriending works with socially isolated older people in West Norfolk. Our clients are isolated due to a long term physical or sensory disability or due to their role as a carer (unpaid). We provide face-to-face befriending, telephone befriending, email and group befriending throughout West Norfolk..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,178 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- WNB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Hayes | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Michael Annable | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Jermyn | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Lisa Marie Cook | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MICHAEL LEE-EVANS | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN WOODS | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA WOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.16k | £73.82k | £50.44k | £67.26k | £59.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.14k | £64.75k | £60.60k | £66.63k | £60.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.23k | £4.20k | £4.20k | £17.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO HAVE BECOME SOCIALLY ISOLATED DUE TO EITHER OR A COMBINATION OF AGE, SENSORY IMPAIRMENT, PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND OR BECAUSE THEY ARE A CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A BEFRIENDING SERVICE IN WEST NORFOLK.
Area of benefit
WEST NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 THORESBY COLLEGE
QUEEN STREET
KING'S LYNN
NORFOLK
PE30 1HX
- Phone:
- 01553763500
- Email:
- info@wnbefriending.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window