Financial history INTERNATIONAL FINANCE FACILITY FOR IMMUNISATION COMPANY

Charity number: 1115413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.24m £167.42m £24.05m £65.47m £1.06bn
Total expenditure £52.40m £59.79m £21.58m £189.06m £171.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £477.92m
Income - Donations and legacies £17.26m £155.69m £8.68m £47.15m £1.06bn
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.98m £11.73m £15.37m £18.32m £3.51m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.79m £40.37m £1.48m £170.70m £166.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.61m £19.42m £20.10m £18.36m £5.33m
Expenditure - Governance £1.46m £1.39m £1.48m £1.65m £1.65m
Expenditure - Grants institution £36.34m £38.98m £0 £0 £164.76m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.47m £1.53m £1.44m £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0