Trustees INTERNATIONAL FINANCE FACILITY FOR IMMUNISATION COMPANY

Charity number: 1115413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth Lay Chair 16 October 2020
None on record
Ingrid van Wees Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Monique Barbut Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Hassatou Diop N'Sele Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Jessica Pulay Trustee 03 March 2020
ENGLISH NATIONAL OPERA
Received: On time
Helge Weiner-Trapness Trustee 17 December 2018
None on record
Bertrand de Mazieres Trustee 18 May 2018
None on record
Doris Aida D Lourdes Herrera Pol Trustee 13 November 2015
None on record