SAATHI HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community and in particular the advancement of education, protection of health and the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for such communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £70,000 from 3 government contract(s) and £130,333 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2006: Standard registration
- SAINT JAMES LANGUAGE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Ridge | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elsa Zenatti-Daniels | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anum Abdullah | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mashkura Begum | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Helga Edstrom | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Shaista Mukadam | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CAROL LYNDON | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Mountain | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.09k | £172.00k | £143.18k | £199.25k | £275.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.75k | £145.00k | £180.17k | £210.25k | £220.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £130.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 26 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (PARTICULARLY IN METROPOLITAN DISTRICTS OF THE UK) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH COMMUNITIES; AND 2. THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING, IN THE UK AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO COUNTRIES OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD, ACTING ALONE OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, EDUCATION, TRAINING, RESIDENTIAL COURSES, ACCOMMODATION AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE, WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF ENABLING INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND STAND ON THEIR OWN TWO FEET.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saathi House
49 Bevington Road
Birmingham
B6 6HR
- Phone:
- 01213280013
- Email:
- info@saathihouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window