ACTION FOR CHILDREN'S ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action for Children's Arts was established in 1998 by a group of children's arts professionals in response to the perceived lack of support of and recognition for the importance of the arts for children. It was then - and still is - the only organisation in the UK dedicated to the promotion, development and celebration of all the creative and performing arts for and with children aged 0-12 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 June 2006: Standard registration
- ACA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA IRELAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter James Dowse | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Benjamin Brailsford Mitchell | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Helen Robertson | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lee Jones | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jarvis | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lynn Whiddington | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Tarbit | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SPEDDING | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.85k | £22.01k | £16.02k | £50.69k | £14.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.27k | £16.74k | £9.31k | £32.47k | £25.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £7.50k | N/A | £9.62k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE ARTISTIC EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING ALL PROFESSIONAL ART FORMS FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 13, WHILST BEARING IN MIND CHILDREN'S VOICES WISHES AND NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 ST. ALBANS AVENUE
LONDON
W4 5JR
- Phone:
- 07886 925112
- Email:
- admin@childrensarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window