POETRY LONDON LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects (the Objects) are to promote the study and writing of contemporary poetry for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian James Webster | Chair | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ali Lewis | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melville Tobechukwu Ofili | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Galleymore | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imtiaz Anil Dharker | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Momtaza Mehri | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Desmarais | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rory Waterman | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Castle | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.76k | £160.78k | £142.36k | £117.36k | £143.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.46k | £160.92k | £169.41k | £153.83k | £145.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £93.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 22 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND WRITING OF CONTEMPORARY POETRY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Poetry London
Goldsmiths
University of London
New Cross
SE14 6NW
- Phone:
- 020 8228 5707
- Email:
- admin@poetrylondon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window