Trustees HIGHTIDE FESTIVAL PRODUCTIONS LTD
Charity number: 1124477
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TIM CLARK | Chair | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Peter Bookbinder | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Juliet Gilkes Romero | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Emily Anstead | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Holmes | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Webb | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Louise Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leah Alison Schmidt | Trustee | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Liz Fosbury | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.