FRIENDS OF THE CHAPEL OF SAINT LAWRENCE, WARMINSTER (FOCSL)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the feoffees of the chapel in maintaining , refurbishing and beautifying the chapel. Variety of fund raising and community activities organised -concerts, sales etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 May 2008: Standard registration
- 26 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1194628 ST LAWRENCE CHAPEL WARMINSTER
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £1.48k | £614 | £610 | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.24k | £4.24k | £300 | £300 | £656 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE FEOFFEES OF THE CHAPEL OF SAINT LAWRENCE AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE CHAPEL AND ITS MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHAPEL AND THE CHAPEL'S GROUND.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WILTSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window