MCF- LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities in, Coleshill, Castle Bromwich and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 June 2009: Standard registration
- MERIDEN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Henry Plumb | Chair | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Christopher John Hunt | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Alan Windridge | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Joseph Cameron FCMA CGMA | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
INIE WILHELMINA JEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HERBERT JEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.14k | £29.51k | £29.68k | £42.02k | £40.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.59k | £27.82k | £26.96k | £40.94k | £44.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 371 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/08/2015
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN MERIDEN AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT'), THROUGH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, BIBLE STUDY SESSIONS AND COURSES ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH HELP, SUPPORT AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
MERIDEN AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victory Hall
76
Chester Road
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 07970552667
- Email:
- mcflifechurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window