THE MID SUSSEX ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the residents of Mid Sussex and the neighbourhood and in particular Muslim residents and to advance religion in accordance with the tenets and doctrines of Islam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANWAR HUSSAIN CHOWDHURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shamsul Haque | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
NOORUL ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOFOJJUL HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED BASHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.45k | £39.21k | £35.42k | £37.69k | £37.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.51k | £28.85k | £28.24k | £40.09k | £40.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 June 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): (I) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MID SUSSEX AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR MUSLIM RESIDENTS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS (INCLUDING OTHER RELIGIOUS ORGANISATIONS) IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS. (II) TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF MID SUSSEX THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. (III) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST RESIDENTS IN MID SUSSEX BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND FROM DIFFERENT FAITHS RELIGIONS AND BELIEFS.
Area of benefit
SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST EDMUNDS HALL
WIVELSFIELD ROAD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 4EQ
- Phone:
- 014444 628909
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window