INTERNATIONAL NETWORK FOR TRADITIONAL BUILDING ARCHITECTURE & URBANISM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INTBAU's mission is to support traditional building, the maintenance of local character, and the creation of better places to live. We do this through workshops, summer schools, study tours, conferences, awards, and competitions. Our three objectives are to research, educate, and engage as widely as possible on the value and relevance of traditional architecture and urban design.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Italy
- Spain
Governance
- 28 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tiffany Elizabeth Unten Abernathy | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Akel Ismail Kahera | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Cusato | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tomasz Nikodem Jelenski | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY ROSE GUNN | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Aslet | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THE RT HON THE LORD LAMONT OF LERWICK | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALIREZA SAGHARCHI | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54m | £102.11k | £574.51k | £1.19m | £254.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £889.88k | £613.28k | £699.53k | £560.58k | £904.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.51m | N/A | £527.53k | £1.17m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £24.45k | N/A | £46.30k | £15.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.00k | N/A | £679 | £158 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £883.38k | N/A | £689.95k | £551.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.50k | N/A | £9.58k | £9.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £3.08k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SIGNIFICANCE AND PRACTICE OF LOCAL, REGIONAL AND NATIONAL TRADITIONS IN BUILDING, ARCHITECTURE AND URBANISM IN THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT; AND TO RESEARCH OR FUND RESEARCH INTO THE SIGNIFICANCE AND PRACTICE OF LOCAL, REGIONAL AND NATIONAL TRADITIONS IN BUILDING, ARCHITECTURE AND URBANISM IN THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19-22 CHARLOTTE ROAD
LONDON
EC2A 3SG
- Phone:
- 02076138578
- Email:
- harriet.wennberg@intbau.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window