WOOLWICH REACH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of children and young people. Improving the social welfare of disadvantaged inhabitants of South London and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Camden
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Lewisham
Governance
- 07 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Lyle | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROMY FRASER | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDWARD COSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.36k | £132.89k | £154.36k | £157.56k | £154.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.36k | £132.89k | £154.36k | £157.56k | £154.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 2 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, TO INCLUDE YOUNG OFFENDERS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 6
MELLISH INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
HARRINGTON WAY
LONDON
SE18 5NR
- Phone:
- 02088559598
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window