CENTRAL NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

60 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 February 2010: Standard registration
- MID NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frank Martin | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS LEECH | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Gillings | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ros Pruden | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Derek Vivian Grimshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Graham Thompson | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Sebastian Bell | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pat Hotston | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Louise Martin | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Eames | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Foster | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Fox | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Pamela Yaxley | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Amos Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Flood | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra Simm | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Junge | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Cumberland | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Moden | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Constantine | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Anne Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Dolphin | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Lodge | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN COLMAN | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Neave | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Mary Allen LRAM, ARCM | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Jill Skinner | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Olwyn Brough | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marion Perryman | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Richmond | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN EWIN | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE BLUNDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA PENGELLEY | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE BERYL BALDRY | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|||||
SALLY MARY MARTIN | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SPARKES HULL MA, B.ED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVRIL ELIZABETH TEMPLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ANN HULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIPPA MARY COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL ROSE EWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AILSA JARDINE WARBURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV ROSEMARY WAKELIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN ELIZABETH DYE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR FRED GARNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS JO TRICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER JOHN GWATKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE IVY WARBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER MARY PARLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSELYN BUNTING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH CATHERINE SOUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL MARY YARHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Aileen Fox | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ROSEMARY WOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW ERNEST DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN LYNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA ANN DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.76k | £218.13k | £221.72k | £264.33k | £234.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.54k | £439.40k | £308.29k | £294.81k | £304.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Trinity Close
DEREHAM
Norfolk
NR19 2EP
- Phone:
- 01603 858261
- Email:
- centralnorfolk@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window