THE BURGON SOCIETY

Charity number: 1137522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Futherance of education in particular through the study of academical dress in all its aspects and the publication and dissemination of research concerning academical dress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £52,591
Total expenditure: £13,213

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Hogg Chair 22 April 2023
None on record
Terence Norman Barcock Trustee 20 April 2024
ELTHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Andrew Martin Plant Trustee 20 April 2024
None on record
Dr John Horton Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
Rev Philip Francis Michael Goff Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
Valentina S Grub Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
Christopher Geoffrey Williams Trustee 09 October 2021
None on record
Alice Ruth Hynes Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Dr Nicholas James Jackson Trustee 13 April 2019
None on record
Dr JONATHAN COOPER Trustee 06 November 2012
None on record
Dr STEPHEN LAWRENCE WOLGAST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.21k £11.66k £18.75k £21.84k £52.59k
Total expenditure £11.22k £8.59k £8.66k £11.54k £13.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
54 Gatehill Gardens
LUTON
LU3 4EZ
Phone:
01582 510954