NORTHERN LIGHTS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 1136322
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Orchestra, advertisment and promotion. Venue hire and design. Lighting and recording.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £985

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 2010: Standard registration
  • 10 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £17.63k £34.31k £27.31k £1.36k £0
Total expenditure £19.95k £29.98k £33.12k £642 £985
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 June 2020 On Time