THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MELTON MOWBRAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a parish we are committed to: Bringing people to a knowledge of God Providing spiritual and pastoral commitment within the Parish and the wider community Being open to all in sharing the mission of Jesus Worshipping together in the churches of our Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- THE PCC OF THE TEAM PARISH OF MELTON MOWBRAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER KEITH KIRBY | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Joy Balding | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ann Joseph Hinde | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Westwater | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth May | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Gumbrill | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Parker | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Parker | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Revd Dr Mary Elizabeth Barr | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Wilson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dickinson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GEORGE WILSON | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Mrs C A Shenton | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Mrs D G Neale | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS J M PENGELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS J E KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR I.A. NEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J. A. MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR C MOULDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £522.30k | £493.32k | £379.10k | £273.93k | £327.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £445.40k | £622.15k | £313.60k | £401.99k | £350.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £50.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £267.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £212.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £16.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £26.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £323.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £121.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £24.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Samworth Centre
8 Burton Street
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE13 1AE
- Phone:
- 01664444171
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window