THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PLYMSTOCK & HOOE, PLYMOUTH.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Plymstock & Hooe Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of co-operating with the clergy of the parish in promoting the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PLYMSTOCK & HOOE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JENNIE APPLEBY | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Graham John Naylor | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sheila Eccleston | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
RICHARD FREDERICK HARVEY | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Ernest Davidson | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Diana Lorraine Pinkham | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth Elliot | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Joan Frances Melville Dee | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Goulding | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Joanne Parker | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
MR GRAHAM LEA | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Delia Lorraine Kevern | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anthony Robert Banbury | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Kerry Gilbert | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Carl James Budden | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Graham Robert Dee | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.99k | £123.16k | £91.81k | £95.13k | £178.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.26k | £155.93k | £124.39k | £76.09k | £136.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | N/A | £1.24k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Cobb Lane
Plymstock
Plymouth
PL9 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01752941844
- Email:
- applebyj5@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window