CARDIFF UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1136855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Taylor Doe Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Professor Stuart Walker Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Professor Rachel Ashworth Trustee 01 August 2020 None on record
JOHN SHAKESHAFT Trustee 01 August 2019
THE GEFFRYE MUSEUM TRUST Received: On time
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ENDOWMENT TRUST Received: On time
DR Janet Helen Wademan Trustee 28 November 2016 None on record
Janet Coulson Juillerat Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
Professor Damian Walford Davies Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Dr Joanna Newman Trustee 01 August 2020
COUNCIL FOR EDUCATION IN THE COMMONWEALTH Received: On time
Professor Marc Buehner Trustee 16 December 2021
THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (SOUTH WALES) Received: On time
PROFESSOR COLIN BRYAN RIORDAN Trustee 01 October 2012
THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED Received: On time
THE UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES ADMISSIONS SERVICE Received: On time
EDGE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Professor Dame Janet Valerie Finch Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
David John Simmons Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Professor Rudolf Allemann Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
Agnes Xavier-Phillips Trustee 14 May 2018
FFIN DANCE Received: 21 days late
Paul Baston Trustee 04 December 2017 None on record
Patrick Younge Trustee 01 January 2022
RUSKIN COLLEGE Received: 112 days late
MICHAEL DAVID HAMPSON Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
Christopher Jones Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Dr Pretty Sagoo Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Judith Anne Fabian Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Georgina Dunn Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Ricardo Leao Calil Trustee 21 August 2019 None on record
JUDGE RAY SINGH CBE Trustee 01 August 2016
RACE COUNCIL CYMRU Received: On time
Kenneth Lawrie Hamilton Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record