Financial history THE FAITH NETWORK FOR MANCHESTER (FN4M)

Charity number: 1144161
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.76k £36.45k £65.50k £59.51k £73.34k
Total expenditure £44.84k £41.47k £55.08k £61.53k £33.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.60k
Income from government grants £48.65k £25.00k £25.40k £5.64k N/A