WILLDEM SMILE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HAVE RESUMED THE SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES OF ENGLISH, MATHS, FRENCH AND SPANISH TO PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL PUPILS, SUPPORTING THEM WITH THEIR HOMEWORK. WE HAVE ALSO INTRODUCED SOME ASPECTS OF CITIZENSHIP. WE HAVE ALSO RESUMED OUR FORTNIGHT AFRICAN DRUMMING AND DANCING AND STORYTELLING. ALL THE ACTIVITIES TAKE PLACE IN TOTTENHAM IN THE BOROUGH OF HARINGEY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Benin
- Ghana
- Togo
Governance
- 25 November 2011: Standard registration
- WSF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTIANE SANVEE | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Erna Sanvee | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA OLAKU | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Akossiwa Ahadzi | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kpoti William Agbodjan | Trustee | 18 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA TSOTSO THIKO | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDJAME AMOU-FOGAN | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.72k | £5.00k | £8.50k | £5.80k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £3.50k | £8.40k | £5.75k | £7.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO LIVE THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL & OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 Carterhatch Lane
Enfield
EN1 4LB
- Phone:
- 07944916283
- Email:
- info@willdemsf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window