THE HUMAN DIGNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1158093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE HUMAN DIGNITY TRUST IS AN ORGANISATION OF INTERNATIONAL LAWYERS SUPPORTING LOCAL PARTNERS TO UPHOLD HUMAN RIGHTS AND CONSTITUTIONAL LAW IN COUNTRIES WHERE HOMOSEXUALITY IS CRIMINALISED. THE TRUST PROVIDES PRO BONO TECHNICAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AND ADVISORY SERVICES AT THE REQUEST OF, AND IN COLLABORATION WITH LOCAL ACTIVISTS, THEIR LAWYERS AND OTHER HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENDERS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Afghanistan
  • Algeria
  • Angola
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Bhutan
  • Botswana
  • Brunei
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cameroon
  • Comoros
  • Cook Islands
  • Dominica
  • Egypt
  • Eritrea
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Ghana
  • Grenada
  • Guinea
  • Guyana
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Jamaica
  • Kenya
  • Kiribati
  • Kuwait
  • Lebanon
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Morocco
  • Namibia
  • Nigeria
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Qatar
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Senegal
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Sudan
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Syria
  • Tanzania
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tonga
  • Tunisia
  • Turkmenistan
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • Uzbekistan
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Conway Blake Chair 24 May 2018
None on record
Kenneth Jones Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Andrew David Arthur Miller Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Sara Jane Wilbourne Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Luis Alfonso Barroso Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Patrick Doris Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Emma Jayne Cusdin Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Professor Michael Kwame Addo Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Matthew Charles Robinson Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.38m £1.12m £1.39m £1.49m £1.75m
Total expenditure £1.30m £935.18k £1.21m £1.37m £1.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £700.53k £448.02k £598.55k £633.67k £439.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.37m £1.10m £1.39m £1.49m £1.73m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.10k £128 £76 £3.90k £20.18k
Income - Other £3.64k £24.73k £0 £2.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £30.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £817.42k £1.08m £1.25m £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £153.55k £117.76k £123.58k £123.53k £132.63k
Expenditure - Governance £5.49k £6.07k £6.48k £86.74k £121.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £63.07k £49.72k £37.18k £27.80k £16.23k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £358.21k £824.44k £862.99k £974.32k £1.27m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £89.80k £353.59k £199.45k £180.51k £79.13k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Human Dignity Trust
4th floor West - Quality House
5 - 9 Quality Court
Chancery Lane
London
WC2A 1HP
Phone:
02074193770