STOCK & BUTTSBURY HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit in the local history and family history, in particular but not exclusively of Stock and Buttsbury parishes, Essex by providing lectures, meetings, forums and facilities for cataloguing, recording and storing information and small artifacts and providing educational resources for local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 31 October 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Patricia Lee | Chair | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
KAREN PATRICIA LE BOUTILLIER | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Francis Borlase Rilstone | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN LE BOUTILLIER | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD PHILLIPS ISO | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £982 | £3 | £181 | £588 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £1.22k | £1.40k | £999 | £735 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 April 2024 | 533 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 November 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LOCAL HISTORY AND FAMILY HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF STOCK AND BUTTSBURY PARISHES, ESSEX BY PROVIDING LECTURES, MEETINGS, FORUMS AND FACILITIES FOR CATALOGUING, RECORDING AND STORING INFORMATION AND SMALL ARTEFACTS AND PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES FOR LOCAL SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stock & Buttsbury Heritage Centre
3 Swan Lane
Stock
INGATESTONE
Essex
CM4 9BQ
- Phone:
- 07717 372580
- Email:
- KBOUTILLIER@LIVE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window