BRADFORD PUNJABI CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promote Punjabi language through direct participation of poets, writers, journalists and artists from all communities and background. Its activities take the form of poetry symposium, teaching of music and dance, lectures and exhibitions on Punjabi heritage, support publish works of local writers and organise live entertainments programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 22 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PALL SINGH DHESI | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SURINDER SINGH MANKU | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIJAY SAMPLAY | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MANJIT SINGH SUMMAN | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MURTI RAM CHUMBER | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHINDER SINGH KHINDA | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOSHIAR SINGH | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HARPAL SINGH | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ASHOK KUMAR NAIR | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £1.20k | £0 | £1.20k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £300 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE PUNJABI ARTS, LITERATURE, MUSIC, DANCE, HERITAGE AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRADFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2.SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Newhall Park Drive
Bradford
BD5 8BR
- Phone:
- 07813208992
- Email:
- BPCS@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
16NewhallParkDrive.Bradford.BD58BR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window