LEADERSHIP THROUGH SPORT AND BUSINESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leadership Through Sport & Business is a national social mobility charity that prepares and supports disadvantaged young people across the UK into meaningful employment with major firms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,265,054
Donations and legacies | £490.28k | |
Charitable activities | £735.23k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £39.55k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,255,931
Raising funds | £69.93k | |
Charitable activities | £1.19m | |
Other | £0 |
£34,636 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.19m | |
Retained for future use | £9.12k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.19m | |
Retained for future use | £43.76k |
People

27 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
322 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2012: Standard registration
- LEADERSHIP THROUGH SPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nabhan Nassor Moore-Bastien | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Kathryn Kirkhope | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
BHARAT MEHTA | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Louise Poulten | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY CHRISTOPHER HAYES | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary John Duggan | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wincie Wong | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Charles Thornton-Smith | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE EMMA BARCLAY | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DARREN GURNER | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02m | £1.18m | £1.53m | £1.76m | £1.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £931.85k | £972.49k | £1.11m | £1.31m | £1.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £723.73k | £745.22k | £752.37k | £754.92k | £490.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £293.54k | £431.56k | £781.77k | £996.53k | £735.23k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £796 | £44 | £352 | £9.08k | £39.55k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £739.19k | £821.55k | £1.04m | £1.14m | £1.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £192.66k | £150.94k | £67.55k | £171.58k | £69.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.04k | £47.95k | £16.80k | £29.50k | £31.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.08k | £10.07k | £6.68k | £2.94k | £384 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £595.24k | £1.03m | £1.54m | £1.79m | £1.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £42.38k | £271.29k | £350.95k | £152.22k | £83.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/04/2015 as amended on 26 Oct 2020 as amended on 18 May 2023
Charitable objects
1.1 The Charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the following for the public benefit: 1.1.1 To advance the Education of the public in general and without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing children and young people in particular through provision of sport training and related opportunities, academic study and life skills experience; 1.1.2 To pursue such other charitable purpose or purposes according to the law of England and Wales as the Trustees in their absolute discretion shall select from time to time. 1.2 Throughout the Articles, 'charitable' means charitable in accordance with the law of England and Wales provided that it will not include any purpose which is not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the 2005 Act. For the avoidance of doubt, the system of law governing the Articles of the Charity is the law of England and Wales. 1.3 This provision may be amended by special resolution but only with the prior written consent of the Commission.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORTON HOUSE
EXCHANGE FLAGS
LIVERPOOL
MERSEYSIDE
L2 3YL
- Phone:
- 01516003079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window