Rescue Benevolent Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make charitable grants and to provide financial and other support in order to alleviate hardship suffered by individuals or their families which has or may have arisen in connection with an individuals service or assistance in a mountain and/or cave rescue organisation or operation. Exclusions apply and are contained in the Declaration of Trust and application form.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 2013: Standard registration
- MCRBF (Working name)
- MOUNTAIN AND CAVE RESCUE BENELOVENT FUND (Previous name)
- MOUNTAIN AND CAVE RESCUE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Brendan Sloan | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Huw Birrell | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Woodhead | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY PRIESTLEY | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|||||
JUDITH WHITESIDE | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.22k | £1.36k | £12.35k | £2.72k | £14.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £2.11k | £2.34k | £8.89k | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/04/2013 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAKE CHARITABLE GRANTS AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT (INCLUDING BY WAY OF SHORT-TERM INTEREST FREE LOANS) IN ORDER TO ALLEVIATE HARDSHIP SUFFERED BY INDIVIDUALS OR THEIR FAMILIES WHICH HAS OR MAY HAVE ARISEN IN CONNECTION WITH (1) AN INDIVIDUALS SERVICE IN A MOUNTAIN AND/OR CAVE ORGANISATION OR (2) AN INDIVIDUALS ASSISTANCE IN RESPECT OF ANY MOUNTAIN AND/OR CAVE OPERATION OR ANY OTHER ANCILLARY ACTIVITY SAVE THAT SUCH SUPPORT SHALL NOT BE GRANTED IN RESPECT OF A SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION? OPERATION OR AN ASSOCIATION OF LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE OPERATION EXCEPT WHERE SUCH OPERATION DIRECTLY RELATES TO A MOUNTAIN AND/OR CAVE RESCUE OPERATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MAPLE GROVE
YORK
YO10 4EJ
- Phone:
- 07767814051
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window