THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK HIGHCLIFFE DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all.Sacred space provided for personal prayer.Pastoral work:visiting the sick and the bereaved.Teaching Christianity through sermons and groups. Running a Church Club in the Primary School.Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, and other groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 December 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARK'S HIGHCLIFFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Eliott | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Quentin Stokes | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Richardson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Russell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Katrina Melvin | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN NASH | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hegarty | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN RHODA STRINGER | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA FAUNCE | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS BRAY | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GOODMAN | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET LYONETTE | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WILLIAM CHATTEN | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.31k | £102.74k | £122.11k | £114.00k | £199.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.25k | £135.73k | £120.80k | £131.50k | £193.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marks Church
Hinton Wood Avenue
CHRISTCHURCH
BH23 5AA
- Phone:
- 01425276433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window