EYE NEED SIGHT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to preserve and protect the health of patients living in poverty in the UK and overseas with a need for refractive correction or any other health issues connected with eyes, in particularly but not exclusively, by providing and assisting in the provision of spectacles, each with their own individual prescription.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DEREK SNELGROVE FBDO | Chair | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RHYS MADOC | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVIS | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|||||
SIMON PETER MCLLWAINE | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £13 | £48 | £48 | £189 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS LIVING IN POVERTY IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, WITH A NEED FOR REFRACTIVE CORRECTION OR ANY OTHER HEALTH ISSUES CONNECTED WITH THE EYES, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPECTACLES, EACH WITH THEIR OWN INDIVIDUAL PRESCRIPTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Maltings Garth
Thurston
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP31 3PP
- Phone:
- 01727899428
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window