OXFORDSHIRE OESOPHAGEAL AND STOMACH ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the treatment and care of persons suffering from oesophageal or stomach cancer and to provide support to those caring for such persons or who are affected by oesophageal or stomach cancer amongst their families or friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Gloucestershire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 July 2013: CIO registration
- OOSO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew George Carter | Chair | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Liz Ward | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Owen | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Dennis | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK MAYNARD | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.79k | £40.27k | £20.99k | £8.69k | £13.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.20k | £19.79k | £7.45k | £8.63k | £22.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM OESOPHAGEAL OR STOMACH CANCER AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THOSE CARING FOR SUCH PERSONS OR WHO ARE AFFECTED BY OESOPHAGEAL OR STOMACH CANCER AMONGST THEIR FAMILIES OR FRIENDS, BY MEANS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF: (A) COUNSELLING, SUPPORT, ADVICE (INCLUDING TELEPHONE ADVICE SERVICES), EDUCATION AND INFORMATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. (B) COUNSELLING AND OTHER SUPPORT TO THE FAMILY AND FRIENDS OF PATIENTS AND TO THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN BEREAVED. (C) EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THESE ILLNESSES. (D) FACILITATION OF MEETINGS BETWEEN PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS, FAMILY AND FRIENDS WITH MEMBERS OF THE CLINICAL TEAM INVOLVED IN TREATMENT. (E) REPRESENTATION OF THE PATIENT VOICE ON MEDICAL COMMITTEES AND SIMILAR FORUMS. (F) MEASURES TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO STOMACH AND OESOPHAGEAL CANCERS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORUMS, WEBSITES, NEWSLETTERS AND OTHER PUBLICITY AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walled Cottage
Thame Road
Great Milton
OXFORD
OX44 7NU
- Phone:
- 07759996969
- Email:
- walledcottage@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window