Accounts and annual returns GIRLS NOT BRIDES: THE GLOBAL PARTNERSHIP TO END CHILD MARRIAGE

Charity number: 1154230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 November 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 November 2017 4 days late Download Open in new window