Financial history GIRLS NOT BRIDES: THE GLOBAL PARTNERSHIP TO END CHILD MARRIAGE

Charity number: 1154230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.06m £3.75m £4.71m £5.16m £3.36m
Total expenditure £2.47m £2.85m £4.99m £4.89m £3.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.06m £3.75m £4.71m £5.16m £3.36m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £723 £534 £2.65k £1.26k
Income - Other £483 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.47m £2.85m £4.99m £4.89m £3.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £205.47k
Expenditure - Governance £10.56k £10.70k £7.52k £11.10k £11.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £51.37k £367.94k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0