Trustees GIRLS NOT BRIDES: THE GLOBAL PARTNERSHIP TO END CHILD MARRIAGE
Charity number: 1154230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anne Gallagher | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Feigelson | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Puig de la Bellacasa Mejia | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zipporah Jean Alaroker | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Sarin | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIA ARNOLD | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lesley Cotton | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.