Dogfen lywodraethu FANZA (FOUNDATION FOR AUSTRALIA AND NEW ZEALAND ARTS)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2020 as amended on 08 Oct 2020 as amended on 13 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(a) To advance the education of the public by promoting and celebrating the range and vitality of Australian and New Zealand life, culture and languages across all art forms including (but not limited to) literature, film, theatre, music, dance, painting and sculpture and photography (b) To promote such life, culture and languages for the benefit of the public by connecting Australian and New Zealand artists, performers and writers with new and established audiences and communities (c) In furtherance of those objects, to partner with and support individuals and organisations in organising, promoting and curating diverse and inspiring events and conversations (d) To maintain and grow a FANZA hub (involving all forms of communication and networking, written, digital, broadcast, film, electronic and social), providing information on the latest news and events featuring Australian and New Zealand arts and culture.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.