BEACON RECOVERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the recovery of addicted persons through the provision of accommodation, support and encouragement to pursue a structured recovery programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,990 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 10 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Canning | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Hughes | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Bloom | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|||||
ANDY WALSH | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £454.65k | £450.38k | £455.43k | £493.71k | £467.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £432.34k | £450.25k | £451.27k | £523.24k | £462.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £452.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.43k | £883 | N/A | £1.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND/OR ALCOHOL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beacon House
1 North Avenue
BRADFORD
BD8 7NH
- Phone:
- 01274499980
- Email:
- bloompj@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window