Accounts and annual returns SEPTURA LIMITED

Charity number: 1158408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 January 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 January 2020 13 November 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2020 13 November 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 January 2019 21 November 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2019 21 November 2019 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 January 2018 16 December 2018 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2018 16 December 2018 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 January 2017 11 November 2017 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 January 2017 11 November 2017 5 days late Download Open in new window