Financial history SEPTURA LIMITED

Charity number: 1158408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/01/2017 06/01/2018 06/01/2019 06/01/2020 06/01/2021
Total gross income £39.24k £35.80k £83.97k £106.47k £95.10k
Total expenditure £42.01k £52.26k £78.70k £142.19k £77.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A