Trustees SEPTURA LIMITED

Charity number: 1158408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTIAN MARK STOBBS Chair 06 January 2014
None on record
Richard Robert Dury Demarchi Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Jonathan Philip Langridge Trustee 16 December 2019
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
LONDON ENGLISH SONG FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Rebecca Johns Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Francis Williams Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
GEORGE DUNCAN-JONES Trustee 06 January 2014
None on record
JESSICA KATHARINE JENNINGS Trustee 06 January 2014
None on record