Trustees NORTH EAST CHILD POVERTY TRUST

Charity number: 1161174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Sutton Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Karen Deen Trustee 10 February 2023
None on record
Amy Richardson Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
Lewis Roberts Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
Philippa Gardiner Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
JANE STREATHER Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record
SATTY RAI Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record