LONDON BAT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
London Bat Group is a nature conservation charity. We carry out educational activities about bats; we conduct bat survey work; and we raise funds to contribute to bat conservation projects in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 March 2015: CIO registration
- 26 May 2016: Funds received from 1068048 LONDON BAT GROUP
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Briggs | Chair | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Greg Hitchcock | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Becky Wilson | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Davies | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Little | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tajinder Lachhar | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ray Lancashire | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Montauban | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.62k | £4.80k | £2.81k | £2.43k | £2.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £339 | £2.36k | £971 | £4.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO Association registered on 12th March 2015, amended on 4th March 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF BATS, THEIR ROOSTS, FEEDING AREAS AND HIBERNACULA IN GREATER LONDON (AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UK IF DEEMED APPROPRIATE); TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND THE GROUP'S MEMBERS IN ALL MATTERS RELATED TO BATS, INCLUDING THE PRODUCTION OF LITERATURE; AND TO PROMOTE THE TRAINING OF MEMBERS FOR LICENSING AS VOLUNTEER BAT WORKERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Bat Conservation Trust
Studio 15
Cloisters House
Battersea Park Road
LONDON
SW8 4BG
- Phone:
- 03451300228
- Email:
- enquiries@londonbats.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window