YOUNG GAMERS AND GAMBLERS EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE YOUNG GAMBLERS EDUCATION TRUST (WHICH HAS A TRADING NAME OF YGAM) HAS A CHARITABLE MISSION IS TO INFORM, EDUCATE AND SAFEGUARD YOUNG PEOPLE AGAINST PROBLEMATIC GAMBLING AND SOCIAL GAMING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,999,938
Donations and legacies | £595.32k | |
Charitable activities | £2.38m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £28.60k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,474,418
Raising funds | £133.10k | |
Charitable activities | £2.34m | |
Other | £0 |
£49,294 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £133.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.34m | |
Retained for future use | £525.52k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £133.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.34m | |
Retained for future use | £574.81k |
People

40 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Gibraltar
- Malta
- Netherlands
Governance
- 26 June 2015: Standard registration
- Young Gamers and Gamblers Education Trust (Working name)
- YOUNG GAMBLERS EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M WOJCIK | Chair | 21 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Iain Matthew Corby | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judy White | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clive William Reeves | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Greaves | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andre Morris | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kwaku Owusu-Ansah | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Lesley White | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Bozzetto | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02m | £1.50m | £2.12m | £2.65m | £3.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10m | £1.11m | £1.97m | £2.31m | £2.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £157.57k | £403.89k | £354.64k | £973.52k | £595.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £23.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £860.32k | £1.07m | £1.77m | £1.67m | £2.38m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £35 | £510 | £1.36k | £2.03k | £28.60k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.02m | £1.10m | £1.82m | £2.19m | £2.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £83.10k | £10.24k | £144.96k | £118.11k | £133.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £19.77k | £0 | £43.58k | £36.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.36k | £59.28k | £65.34k | £61.54k | £84.11k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £515.59k | £676.93k | £726.22k | |
|
Other assets | £269.82k | £1.39m | £1.21m | £664.18k | £2.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £313.94k | £1.09m | £1.27m | £628.48k | £1.62m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2015 as amended on 04 Oct 2019 as amended on 26 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Mar 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
The advancement of mental and physical health and wellbeing through the provision of training, education, resources, and strategic partnerships to support the interests of children, young people, and other vulnerable groups, preventing harms related to gaming, gambling and online behaviours through education and earlier intervention; and The advancement of science through research and understanding of matters relating to gaming, gambling and online behaviours amongst children, young people and other vulnerable groups, with a focus on the prevention of harms.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young Gamblers Education Trust
71 - 75 Shelton Street
Covent Garden
London
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 02038374963
- Email:
- hello@ygam.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window