TZIVOS HASHEM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Orthodox Jewish Faith through Jewish education. To provide social welfare and conduct services, meetings, educational facilities, to be carried out in accordance with the principles of orthodox Jewish laws and practices and such other purposes as are recognised by English law as charitable and to act in association with other similar bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2015: Standard registration
- CHABAD HOUSE GOLDERS GREEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elimelech Yitzchak Sufrin | Chair | 27 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
Aleksey Boruch Josef Vilensky | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dov Katzel | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Bracha Brenda Chantal Benchemhoun | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
ELI ITZINGER | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.21k | £406.32k | £261.29k | £420.10k | £391.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.89k | £270.99k | £251.20k | £345.72k | £444.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/09/2015 as amended on 03 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1) The advancement of the Orthodox Jewish faith. 2) To preserve intangible Jewish heritage by preserving heritage and traditional crafts related to the Orthodox Jewish Faith by means of: collecting related artefacts, researching the crafts and ensuring their continuity through practical training. 3) To advance public appreciation of intangible Jewish heritage through educational activities promoting heritage and traditional crafts related to the Orthodox Jewish Faith. 4) To advance education and training of young people in subjects which will develop their capacity and skills, giving them the tools and guidance for improving their social skills, autonomy and independence. 5) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chabad House Golders Green
Golders Green Library
156 Golders Green Road
LONDON
NW11 8HE
- Phone:
- 02084580416
- Email:
- info@tzivoshashem.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window