LLANDRILLO READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides Building/Facilities.for the use of the elderly, young people other charities and voluntary bodies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 04 November 1977: Standard registration
- LLANDRILLO COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- LLANDRILLOR READING ROOM (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUW LLOYD | Chair |
|
||||||
GERAINT DAVIES JONES | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR HUGH LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DELWYN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA SUZANNE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.12k | £10.01k | £1.59k | £24.88k | £8.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £4.48k | £6.68k | £22.00k | £17.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £11.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23 JUNE 1977
Charitable objects
A READING ROOM FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF LLANDRILLO IN THE COUNTY OF CLWYD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLICTICAL, REGIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF LLANDRILLO
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIMAR
BERWYN STREET
LLANDRILLO
CORWEN
LL21 0TH
- Phone:
- 01490440351
- Email:
- brimar@boyns.cymru
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window