EFFERVESCENT SOCIAL ALCHEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Researching and developing cultural activities, including visual and performing arts, for health and wellbeing, and education impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £11,135 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 15 December 2015: Standard registration
- 26 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1062970 THE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY
- EFFERVESCENT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.10k | £233.92k | £138.92k | £384.76k | £330.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.61k | £260.68k | £465.23k | £306.83k | £291.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | £29.22k | £11.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/08/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/08/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY:- A. IN THE CREATIVE ARTS; AND B. BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO PROFESSIONALS WORKING WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. (2) TO:- A. ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND B. PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE USE OF THE CREATIVE ARTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window