RELIGION MEDIA CENTRE

Charity number: 1169562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download