Trustees FND ACTION

Charity number: 1169554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Plender Chair 09 August 2022
None on record
Danyal Mackenzie Trustee 11 December 2024
None on record
Jenay Brehm Trustee 11 December 2024
None on record
Lisa Jane Dickinson Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Richmond Stace Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Timothy Richard Joseph Nicholson Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
James Thomas Shipley Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Eric Rosser Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record