SKIPTON IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote horticulture and floriculture for the benefit of the public generally and in particular those who live in or visit Skipton by the provision of floral displays, shrubs and landscapes in places visible to the public and by the promotion of gardening competitions, conservation of the environment and community involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN WARBURTON | Chair | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||||
David Baxter | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
JENNIFER MARGARET PRATT | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||||
REX GELDARD | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT GEOFFREY HESELTINE | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|||||||||
David Bradbury | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|||||||||
DEIRDRE GILLIAN POLLITT | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|||||||||
MICHAEL MYERS | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £2.01k | £5.89k | £4.97k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £3.14k | £4.96k | £3.01k | £6.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT SKIPTON BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND BY THE PROMOTION OF GARDENING COMPETITIONS, CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Skipton Town Council
Armoury House
45a Otley Street
Skipton
North Yorkshire
BD23 1EL
- Phone:
- 01756700553
- Email:
- info@skiptoninbloom.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window