BASILDON BOROUGH HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public, in the history and heritage of Basildon Borough through the collection, preservation of records, material and artefacts of historical significance. By making available through display and talks at the societies location and around the borough - 'Green Centre', Wat Tyler Country Park, Pitsea Hall Lane, Pitsea, Basildon, Essex SS16 4UH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
Governance
- 30 November 2017: Standard registration
- BASILDON HERITAGE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD VINCENT GREGORY | Chair | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Danny Lawrence | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Geraldine Evans JP | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN CHARLES BAMBRIDGE | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TONY BALL | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.95k | £3.22k | £1.20k | £2.96k | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.10k | £1.35k | £2.32k | £3.80k | £1.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 November 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE: 3.1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF BASILDON BOROUGH, AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE COLLECTION, PRESERVATION AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC OF RECORDS, MATERIAL AND ARTEFACTS OF HISTORIC SIGNIFICANCE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE AND COLLECTION FOR THE PRESERVATION OF SUCH RECORDS, MATERIALS AND ARTEFACTS. 3.2. TO OTHERWISE ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH TOPICS OF EDUCATIONAL MERIT AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 WELBECK DRIVE
LANGDON HILLS
BASILDON
SS16 6BU
- Phone:
- 07968313614
- Website:
-
WWW.BASILDONHERITAGE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window