CLAPHAM WRITERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clapham Writers is responsible for design and delivery of the Clapham Book Festival, the annual south London celebration of books and reading, and associated charitable activities promoting literacy, writing and books, especially in Clapham and nearby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 06 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anderson | Chair | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penelope McNeile | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BUCHAN | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £0 | £1.70k | £2.85k | £2.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £120 | £1.64k | £2.11k | £2.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 May 2024 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN LITERATURE, WRITING AND ASSOCIATED ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH CLAPHAM BOOK FESTIVAL AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 ABBEVILLE ROAD
LONDON
SW4 9JL
- Phone:
- 02077206005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window