CHRISTIAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of Christian education and the facilitation of the establishment and operation of Christian schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 03 November 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROGER STANLEY SLACK | Chair |
|
||||||
Athol Lowell Few | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR PETER ERIC MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS BRENDA LEWIS CERT ED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £617 | £530 | £308 | £13.93k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.58k | £15.20k | £10.05k | £12.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 June 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/10/1980
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE WHOLE MAN THROUGH A GENERAL EDUCATION IN THE BEST AND WIDEST SENSE WITH A WIDE CHOICE OF INTENT AND ACTIVITY AND AN APPRECIATION OF SPIRITUAL VALUES. SPECIFICALLY THE PRESENTATION OF THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH BOTH BY EXAMPLE AND TEACHING IS TO BE AN ESSENTIAL AIM OF THE SCHOOL'S LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 HEATON MOOR ROAD
STOCKPORT
SK4 4NX
- Phone:
- 01614323782
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window