THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WOODLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The P.C.C. promotes activities which further the vision of Emmanuel which is "to impact and influence our community with the good news of Jesus". We are focused on putting our faith into practice and reaching out to everyone, regardless of race, ethnicity, religion, sexuality or gender. We seek to serve through practical help like putting on clubs and events for different ages and interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 03 November 2017: Standard registration
- Emmanuel Church Centre (Working name)
- EMMANUEL CHURCH PCC, WOODLEY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rose-Mary Harriett Jones | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Baker | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shane Stevens | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Colyer | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claire Rachel Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Holmes | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Collins | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrew Mullens | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOOLNOUGH | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
KIERAN PEARSON | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Rhodes | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HOGG | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally Kerry | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.77k | £281.08k | £182.90k | £141.09k | £140.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.53k | £125.89k | £112.00k | £125.33k | £124.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.97k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
EMMANUEL CHURCH CENTRE
SOUTH LAKE CRESCENT
WOODLEY
READING
RG5 3QW
- Phone:
- 01183753718
- Email:
- info@emmanuelwoodley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window